Cintas board members
WebBoard Members Robert Angelico President & Managing Partner Liskow & Lewis Joe Arroyo President Fire Extinguisher & Supply Company, Inc. David Aubrey VP of External Affairs AT&T Louisiana Scott Ballard, Treasurer Founder Ballard Brands Bobby Barousse Chief Financial Officer Elmer Candy Corporation Bob Barton Managing Partner Taylor Porter WebApr 11, 2024 · An independent member of Cintas’ Board, Mucci will serve on the Audit Committee and the Nominating and Corporate Governance Committee. In addition to Paychex’s Board, on which he has served since 2010, Mucci also sits on the Board of NCR Corporation, which provides digital consulting services and products to connected …
Cintas board members
Did you know?
WebOn behalf of the Board of Directors (the Board) and employee-partners of Cintas Corporation (the Company), I invite you to attend our Annual Meeting of Shareholders (Annual Meeting) on October 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Eastern Daylight Time. This year’s Annual Meeting will be a virtual meeting of shareholders. WebNov 18, 2024 · Todd Schneider is a President & COO at CINTAS CORP. Joseph M. Scaminace Board Member John F. Barrett Board Member Gerald S. Adolph Board …
WebCurrent Vendors - app.buyboard.com WebApr 11, 2024 · An independent member of Cintas' Board, Mucci will serve on the Audit Committee and the Nominating and Corporate Governance Committee. In addition to Paychex's Board, on which he has served since ...
WebCintas's President & Chief Executive Officer, Director is Todd Schneider. Other executives include J. Michael Hansen, Executive Vice President and Chief Financial Officer; … WebNov 18, 2024 · ATLANTA – November 18, 2024 – PulteGroup, Inc. (NYSE: PHM), one of America’s largest homebuilding companies, today announced the appointment of J. …
WebApr 13, 2024 · April 13, 2024 Cintas Corp. has appointed Martin “Marty” Mucci to its board of directors. Mucci is currently chairman of the board at Rochester, New York-based …
WebShe served as a management board member on numerous Johnson & Johnson operating company boards from 1997 to 2009, including Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Ethicon Endo Surgery and Johnson & Johnson Medical. ... Cintas' Board of Directors approved a change in dividend policy from an annual dividend to quarterly dividends. All … how do you dilate a shapeWebDr. Altman is a member of the John W. Altman Institute for Entrepreneurship Advisory Board. C. Michael Armstrong Retired Chairman of the Board of Trustees, John Hopkins Medicine, Chairman of Comcast and the former Chairman & CEO of … how do you dilate a trianglehttp://www.miamioh.edu/fsb/focus-areas/strategic-partners/board-of-visitors/index.html phoenix from ashes nytWeb9 rows · Company profile for Cintas Corp. including key executives, insider trading, ownership, revenue and ... phoenix fund investments difc limitedWebApr 11, 2024 · CINCINNATI, April 11, 2024 -- ( BUSINESS WIRE )-- Cintas Corporation (Nasdaq: CTAS) today elected Martin "Marty" Mucci to its Board of Directors, effective … phoenix frenchtown miWebBoard members at this company. John F. Barrett. Gerald S. Adolph. Joseph Scaminace. Expand. As a member of Board of Directors at CINTAS CORP , John F. Barrett made … how do you dilate a triangle by 2Webmembers of the Audit Committee. Members of the Audit Committee shall serve at the pleasure of the Board until the Board determines it is in the best interest of Cintas to rotate Committee members or until such Audit Committee member is no longer a Board member. (3) Chair – The Board shall appoint, based on the recommendation of the Nominating and phoenix funding group troy mi